Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 868 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5442 Week
» 33400 Month
» 68042 Year
» 1289607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3949 09/04/1960
TOPS (Tops) 08781 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/04/1960
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) 09/04/1960
81C Southall 4w/e 13/08/1960
81F Oxford 4w/e 14/07/1962
81F Oxford 4w/e 27/07/1963
85A Worcester 2w/e 31/05/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/04/1960 To Service To service as D3949
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
   
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
31/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08781    

prev prev