Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1333 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14739 Week
» 67755 Month
» 187282 Year
» 3214135 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3954 |
29/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08786 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/04/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3954 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08786 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|