Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 425 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 425 Week
» 22931 Month
» 326121 Year
» 1547686 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3955 23/04/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08787 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0823/04/1960
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 23/04/1960 to Old Oak Common (81A)
Withdrawn 14/02/1991 off Cardiff Canton (CF)
Time in Service 30 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 13/05/1994
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) on 23/04/1960
81C Southall 4w/e 13/08/1960
81A Old Oak Common 2w/e 07/02/1965
CF Cardiff Canton on 08/12/1980
   Withdrawn on 14/02/1991


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/04/1960 To Service To service as D3955
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
   
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
07/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08787    
14/02/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 08787 from Cardiff Canton (CF)    
13/05/1994 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev