Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 618 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2733 Week
» 25239 Month
» 328429 Year
» 1549994 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3961 21/05/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08793 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0821/05/1960
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 21/05/1960 to Old Oak Common (81A)
Withdrawn 23/07/1993 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (AB)
Time in Service 33 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 01/11/2000
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) on 21/05/1960
81C Southall 4w/e 03/12/1960
81A Old Oak Common 9w/e 18/03/1968
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 24/01/1970
81A Old Oak Common 9w/e 04/04/1970
HA Haymarket on 04/10/1987
   Withdrawn on 23/07/1993


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/05/1960 To Service To service as D3961
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
   
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Old Oak Common depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
24/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
04/04/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08793    
23/07/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 08793 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (AB)    
01/11/2000 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev