Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 870 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5444 Week
» 33402 Month
» 68044 Year
» 1289609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3963 21/05/1960
TOPS (Tops) 08795 01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/05/1960
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) 21/05/1960
81F Oxford 4w/e 13/08/1960
81F Oxford 4w/e 27/07/1963
81C Southall 4w/e 11/07/1965
81A Old Oak Common 9w/e 18/03/1968
LA Laira w/e 28/09/1974
SW Swindon 2w/e 25/01/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/05/1960 To Service To service as D3963
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
   
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Old Oak Common depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08795    
28/09/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
25/01/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SW)    

prev prev