Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3076 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16482 Week
» 69498 Month
» 189025 Year
» 3215878 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3972 |
18/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08804 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3972 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08804 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SW) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|