Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 524 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2639 Week
» 25145 Month
» 328335 Year
» 1549900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3972 18/06/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08804 04/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0818/06/1960
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 18/06/1960 to St Blazey (83E)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83E St Blazey (New) on 18/06/1960
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 16/07/1960
81F Oxford 4w/e 13/08/1960
81F Oxford 4w/e 27/07/1963
81C Southall 4w/e 11/07/1965
81A Old Oak Common 9w/e 25/01/1969
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 06/12/1969
82C Swindon 4w/e 24/01/1970
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 24/01/1970
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 8w/e 27/02/1971
SW Swindon 3w/e 12/07/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/06/1960 To Service To service as D3972
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to St Blazey (83E)
   
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Old Oak Common depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
06/12/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
24/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
24/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
27/02/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08804    
12/07/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SW)    

prev prev