Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2258 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15664 Week
» 68680 Month
» 188207 Year
» 3215060 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3973 |
25/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08805 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3973 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08805 |
|
|