Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4983 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20595 Week
» 119240 Month
» 321904 Year
» 3348757 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3974 |
25/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08806 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1976 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/1976 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3974 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08806 |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
31/08/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08806 |
|
|
30/06/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|