Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 222 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 222 Week
» 11769 Month
» 411451 Year
» 488038 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3977 09/07/1960
TOPS (Tops) 08809 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 09/07/1960
Withdrawn 01/12/1993 off Allerton (AN)
Time in Service 33 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) 09/07/1960
84B Oxley 4w/e 13/08/1960
2F Bescot w/e 22/04/1967
   Withdrawn 01/12/1993

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/07/1960 To Service To service as D3977
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)
   
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
04/03/1962 Sightings Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08809    
01/12/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 08809 from Allerton (AN)    

prev prev