Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 187 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5941 Week
» 33899 Month
» 68541 Year
» 1290106 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3985 13/08/1960
TOPS (Tops) 08817 11/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 13/08/1960
Withdrawn 31/05/2004
Time in Service 43 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys
Cut Up 31/12/2005
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Bryn Engineering, Wigan)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84E Tyseley (New) 13/08/1960
2E Saltley w/e 07/10/1967
64B Haymarket w/e 30/10/1971
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 01/01/1972
   Withdrawn 31/05/2004


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/08/1960 To Service To service as D3985
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
30/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
11/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08817    
31/05/2004 Withdrawn Condemned as 08817    
31/12/2005 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Bryn Engineering, Wigan    

prev prev