Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1717 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25348 Week
» 90302 Month
» 292966 Year
» 3319819 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3988 |
27/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08820 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/08/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3988 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bromsgrove (85D) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
02/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08820 |
|
|
22/02/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08820 from Longsight (LO) |
|
|
07/10/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|