Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 187 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5941 Week
» 33899 Month
» 68541 Year
» 1290106 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3996 01/10/1960
TOPS (Tops) 08828 07/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 01/10/1960
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84E Tyseley (New) 01/10/1960
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 03/12/1960
2F Bescot w/e 22/04/1967
16A Toton w/e 16/12/1967
ED Eastfield w/e 26/06/1976
AB Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 31/12/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    
01/10/1960 To Service To service as D3996
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
16/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
07/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08828    
26/06/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
31/12/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (AB)    

prev prev