Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 359 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18162 Week
» 71178 Month
» 190705 Year
» 3217558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3996 |
01/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08828 |
07/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3996 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
16/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08828 |
|
|
26/06/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
31/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (AB) |
|
|