Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2215 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15621 Week
» 68637 Month
» 188164 Year
» 3215017 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3999 |
22/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08831 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
27/01/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
27/01/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3999 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08831 |
|
|
23/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
26/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/04/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08831 from Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
29/03/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|