Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 828 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5799 Week
» 20376 Month
» 383621 Year
» 460208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4 26/09/1959
TOPS (Tops) 44004 08/04/1974

Names Carried
Name Date From
GREAT GABLE 26/09/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 44
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 26/09/1959
Withdrawn 30/11/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1B Camden (New) 26/09/1959
17A Derby w/e 26/09/1959
1B Camden w/e 02/04/1960
18A Toton w/e 03/03/1962
D16 Nottingham Division 16/01/1965
   Withdrawn 30/11/1980

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 
 

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
26/09/1959 To Service To service as D4, name: GREAT GABLE
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Camden (1B)
   
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
08/04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 44004    
30/11/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 44004    

prev prev