Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 96 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17899 Week
» 70915 Month
» 190442 Year
» 3217295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D40 |
26/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45133 |
16/07/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
26/07/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
10/05/1987 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys |
Cut Up |
19/10/1990 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
15/10/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
15/10/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
05/12/1963 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D40 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
07/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
16/07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45133 |
|
|
20/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
10/05/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45133 |
|
|
19/10/1990 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|