Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 388 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 1260 Week
» 13038 Month
» 302430 Year
» 813532 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D400 07/10/1967
TOPS (Tops) 50050 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Fearless 23/08/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 07/10/1967
Withdrawn 01/03/1994
Withdrawal Reason Surplus to requirements
Time in Service 26 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
WL Western Lines (LMR) (New) 07/10/1967
D05 Stoke Division 17/06/1968
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 21/10/1972
OC Old Oak Common w/e 11/05/1974
LA Laira 2w/e 10/04/1976
   Withdrawn 01/03/1994

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/10/1967 To Service To service as D400
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)
   
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
27/07/1969 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop - collision damage RO 9/1969 Link
21/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50050    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
10/04/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
23/08/1978 Naming Named 'Fearless' at Plymouth Station    
01/03/1994 Withdrawn Condemned as 50050    

prev