Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2426 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15832 Week
» 68848 Month
» 188375 Year
» 3215228 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4001 |
05/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08833 |
11/1973 |
|
TOPS (09/1) |
09101 |
17/08/1992 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 08 | 05/11/1960 | 09/1 | 17/08/1992 |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
05/11/1960 to Tyseley (84E) |
Status |
In Service |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
01/1974 |
xr |
Dual brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4001 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
16/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
16/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08833 |
|
|
01/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
17/08/1992 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09101 |
|
|