Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 13 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6859 Week
» 18406 Month
» 418088 Year
» 494675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 485   11/1921
LMS 9395   08/1928
BR 49395   09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 11/1921
Withdrawal During 11/1959
Service Life 38 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
2C Northampton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8C Speke Junction 4w/e 09/09/1950
9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 17/07/1948
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 26/08/1950
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 20/04/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   w/e 07/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1921 To Service To service as LNWR Number 485    
08/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9395    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 49395    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49395    
26/11/1961 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
08/04/1962 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop. SLS 5/1962 Link

prev