Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 258 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 4499 Week
» 21448 Month
» 135709 Year
» 1020090 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 429 m/e 01/1922
LMS 9413 m/e 08/1926
BR 49413 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 01/1922
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 39 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
2A Rugby 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 08/03/1947
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
WDN   w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1922 To Service To service as LNWR Number 429    
08/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9413    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49413    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 49413    

prev prev