Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 247 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1533 Week
» 29007 Month
» 326021 Year
» 402608 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1142   02/1875
MR (1907) 2900   12/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22900   28/01/1935
BR 58114   11/08/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114202/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number M7943/a
Works Number 2002
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1875
Withdrawal Sun 14/07/1957 off Canklow (19C)
Scrapping During y/e 1957 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 82 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 14/07/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 22/06/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1906 18" Cylinders fitted
02/1908 Diagram B(b) boiler fitted
07/1917 Diagram G6 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1142
Built at Kitson, Works Number 2002
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
11/1906 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
12/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2900    
02/1908 Modification Diagram B(b) boiler fitted    
07/1917 Modification Diagram G6 boiler fitted    
28/01/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 22900    
11/08/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 58114    
1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
14/07/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 58114 from Canklow (19C )    

prev