Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 251 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1537 Week
» 29011 Month
» 326025 Year
» 402612 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1143   03/1875
MR (1907) 2901   08/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22901   03/11/1934
BR 58115   19/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114203/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number M7943/a
Works Number 2003
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1875
Withdrawal Fri 24/03/1961 off Barrow in Furness (12E)
Scrapping During y/e 1961 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 86 yrs , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 24/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 18/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1894 18" Cylinders fitted
08/1907 Diagram B(b) boiler fitted
06/1918 Diagram G6 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1143
Built at Kitson, Works Number 2003
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
04/1894 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
08/1907 Modification Diagram B(b) boiler fitted    
08/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2901    
06/1918 Modification Diagram G6 boiler fitted    
03/11/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22901    
19/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58115    
1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
24/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 58115 from Barrow in Furness (12E )    

prev prev