Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1144   03/1875
MR (1907) 2902   06/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22902   21/04/1934
BR 58116   31/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114203/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number M7943/a
Works Number 2004
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1875
Withdrawal Thu 28/01/1960 off Barrow in Furness (11A)
Scrapping During y/e 1960 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 84 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 23/02/1952
   Withdrawn 28/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   w/e 23/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1904 18" Cylinders fitted
07/1907 Diagram B(b) boiler fitted
01/1921 Diagram G6 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1144
Built at Kitson, Works Number 2004
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
08/1904 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
06/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2902    
07/1907 Modification Diagram B(b) boiler fitted    
01/1921 Modification Diagram G6 boiler fitted    
21/04/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22902    
31/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58116    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
28/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 58116 from Barrow in Furness (11A )    

prev prev