Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1146   03/1875
MR (1907) 2904   08/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22904   08/09/1934
BR 58117   06/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114203/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number M7943/a
Works Number 2006
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1875
Withdrawal Sat 24/03/1956 off Monument Lane (3E)
Scrapping During y/e 1956 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 81 yrs , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
3D Aston 8w/e 14/06/1952
3E Monument Lane 4w/e 21/02/1953
   Withdrawn 24/03/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3D Aston w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 3D Aston 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   w/e 10/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1901 18" Cylinders fitted
11/1915 Diagram B(b) boiler fitted
10/1917 Diagram G6 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1146
Built at Kitson, Works Number 2006
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
12/1901 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
08/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2904    
11/1915 Modification Diagram B(b) boiler fitted    
10/1917 Modification Diagram G6 boiler fitted    
08/09/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22904    
06/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58117    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
24/03/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 58117 from Monument Lane (3E )    

prev prev