Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 251 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1537 Week
» 29011 Month
» 326025 Year
» 402612 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1149   04/1875
MR (1907) 2907   10/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22907   21/04/1934
BR 58118   25/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114204/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number M7943/a
Works Number 2009
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1875
Withdrawal Thu 28/01/1960 off Bushbury (3B)
Scrapping During y/e 1960 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 84 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
3B Bushbury w/e 31/01/1959
   Withdrawn 28/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 4C Swansea (Upper Bank) w/e 28/02/1948
EXLOAN 2D Nuneaton w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC 3B Bushbury 5w/e 31/01/1959
WDN   w/e 23/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1889 18" Cylinders fitted
07/1920 Diagram G6 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1149
Built at Kitson, Works Number 2009
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
11/1889 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
10/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2907    
07/1920 Modification Diagram G6 boiler fitted    
21/04/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22907    
25/02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 58118    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
28/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 58118 from Bushbury (3B )    

prev prev