Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 117 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1403 Week
» 28877 Month
» 325891 Year
» 402478 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1153   06/1875
MR (1907) 2911   08/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22911   08/09/1934
BR 58119   16/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114206/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number M7943/a
Works Number 2013
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 06/1875
Withdrawal Tue 19/05/1959 off Bushbury (3B)
Scrapping During y/e 1959 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 83 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 19/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3B Bushbury w/e 23/10/1948
WDN   w/e 16/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1903 18" Cylinders fitted
05/1916 Diagram B(b) boiler fitted
03/1921 Diagram G6 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1153
Built at Kitson, Works Number 2013
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
11/1903 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
08/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2911    
05/1916 Modification Diagram B(b) boiler fitted    
03/1921 Modification Diagram G6 boiler fitted    
08/09/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22911    
16/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58119    
1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
19/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 58119 from Bushbury (3B )    

prev prev