Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1163   04/1875
MR (1907) 2931   10/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22931   16/06/1934
BR 58129   30/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114204/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
Order Number M7943/b
Works Number 806
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1875
Withdrawal Fri 25/02/1955 off Plaistow (33A)
Scrapping During y/e 1955 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 79 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/04/1952
   Withdrawn 25/02/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/04/1952
WDN   05/02/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
0000 Diagram G6 boiler fitted
09/1899 18" Cylinders fitted
10/1914 Diagram B(b) boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1163
Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 806
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
09/1899 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
10/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2931    
10/1914 Modification Diagram B(b) boiler fitted    
16/06/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22931    
30/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58129    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
02/08/1954 Sightings Bow Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting entry on shed. RO 9/1954 Link
1955 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
25/02/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 58129 from Plaistow (33A )    

prev prev