Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1164   04/1875
MR (1907) 2932   11/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22932   11/08/1934
BR 58130   19/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114204/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
Order Number M7943/b
Works Number 807
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1875
Withdrawal Tue 19/05/1959 off Burton (17B)
Scrapping During y/e 1959 at Albert Looms (Spondon)
Service Life 84 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 19/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 16/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1906 18" Cylinders fitted
07/1917 Diagram G6 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1164
Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 807
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
09/1906 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
11/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2932    
07/1917 Modification Diagram G6 boiler fitted    
11/08/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22932    
19/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58130    
1959 Scrapped Broken up by Albert Looms: Spondon    
19/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 58130 from Burton (17B )    

prev prev