Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1165   04/1875
MR (1907) 2933   10/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22933   21/04/1934
BR 58131   25/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114204/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
Order Number M7943/b
Works Number 808
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1875
Withdrawal Sat 25/02/1961 off Kentish Town (14B)
Scrapping During y/e 1961 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 85 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
14B Kentish Town 3w/e 14/01/1950
   Withdrawn 25/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 31/12/1949
WDN   w/e 18/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1892 18" Cylinders fitted
08/1915 Diagram B(b) boiler fitted
07/1917 Diagram G6 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1165
Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 808
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
05/1892 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
10/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2933    
08/1915 Modification Diagram B(b) boiler fitted    
07/1917 Modification Diagram G6 boiler fitted    
21/04/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22933    
25/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58131    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
25/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 58131 from Kentish Town (14B )    

prev prev