Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 247 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1533 Week
» 29007 Month
» 326021 Year
» 402608 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1166   04/1875
MR (1907) 2934   05/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22934   03/11/1934
BR 58132   28/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114204/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
Order Number M7943/b
Works Number 809
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1875
Withdrawal Tue 19/05/1959 off Derby (17A)
Scrapping During y/e 1959 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 84 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 19/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   w/e 16/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
0000 Diagram G6 boiler fitted
05/1898 18" Cylinders fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1166
Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 809
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
05/1898 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
05/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2934    
03/11/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22934    
28/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58132    
1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
19/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 58132 from Derby (17A )    

prev prev