Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1167   04/1875
MR (1907) 2935   04/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22935   03/11/1934
BR 58133   06/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114204/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
Order Number M7943/b
Works Number 810
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1875
Withdrawal Sat 31/12/1955 off Nottingham (16A)
Scrapping During y/e 1956 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 80 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
16A Nottingham 2w/e 17/06/1950
   Withdrawn 31/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16A Nottingham w/e 10/06/1950
WDN   w/e 10/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1892 18" Cylinders fitted
03/1919 Diagram G6 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1167
Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 810
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
11/1892 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
04/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2935    
03/1919 Modification Diagram G6 boiler fitted    
03/11/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22935    
06/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58133    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
31/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 58133 from Nottingham (16A )    
1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    

prev prev