Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1176   05/1875
MR (1907) 2944   05/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22944   11/08/1934
BR 58135   28/01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114205/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
Order Number M7943/b
Works Number 819
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1875
Withdrawal Fri 06/10/1961 off Monument Lane (21E)
Scrapping During y/e 1961 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 86 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
16A Nottingham 2w/e 17/06/1950
20C Royston 4w/e 27/02/1954
2A Rugby 4w/e 06/11/1954
2F Market Harborough 4w/e 05/11/1955
3A Bescot 4w/e 03/12/1955
5B Crewe South 4w/e 10/08/1957
3E Monument Lane w/e 09/05/1959
   Withdrawn 06/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16A Nottingham w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 20C Royston 4w/e 20/02/1954
LOAN 2A Rugby 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 2F Market Harborough 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   w/e 23/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1899 18" Cylinders fitted
04/1917 Diagram B(b) boiler fitted
02/1922 Diagram G6 boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1176
Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 819
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
12/1899 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
05/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2944    
04/1917 Modification Diagram B(b) boiler fitted    
02/1922 Modification Diagram G6 boiler fitted    
11/08/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22944    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
28/01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 58135    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Market Harborough (2F)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    
06/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 58135 from Monument Lane (21E )    

prev prev