Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1177   05/1875
MR (1907) 2945   10/1907
LMS (Dup.) 22945   03/11/1934
BR 58136   06/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Johnson
Class 1142
Company History MR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
114205/1875
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
Order Number M7943/b
Works Number 820
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1875
Withdrawal Sun 06/10/1957 off Stourton (55B)
Scrapping During y/e 1957 at Locomotive Works (Horwich)
Service Life 82 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 06/10/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   09/09/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
0000 Diagram G6 boiler fitted
08/1904 18" Cylinders fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1875 To Service To service as MR Number 1177
Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 820
Diagram B(a) boiler fitted
   
08/1904 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
10/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 2945    
03/11/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 22945    
06/10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 58136    
1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Horwich    
06/10/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 58136 from Stourton (55B )    

prev prev