Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 986 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6584 Week
» 29090 Month
» 332280 Year
» 1553845 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4009 on 18/05/1907
Great Western Railway (Renum) A1 m/e 01/1936
Great Western Railway 100A1   17/02/1936

Names Carried
Date From Name
18/05/1907 SHOOTING STAR
01/1936 LLOYD'S

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class Star
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Star18/05/1907
Castle09/04/1925
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 168
Works Number 2237
To Service Mon 18/05/1907 to Laira (LA)
Withdrawal Mon 06/03/1950 off Old Oak Common (81A)
Scrapping During 05/1950 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 42 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 1780 0118 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1733 05/1907 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1959 04/05/1915 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1940 1920 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1855 05/1923 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1750 04/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g Intermediate 2378 01/1926 GWR 3,500g
Collett 3,500g Intermediate 2376 04/1926 GWR 3,500g
Churchward 3,500g 1938 12/1926 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1938 06/1927 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1948 03/1928 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 2224 07/1928 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1941 09/1928 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2433 13/07/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2447 28/11/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2417 12/05/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2411 20/04/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 24/01/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2606 26/10/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2737 18/07/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2732 14/08/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2392 26/06/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2580 19/02/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2431 20/09/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2843 05/04/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2671 11/12/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2783 04/08/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g Oil 2792 09/01/1947 GWR 4,000g
Collett 4,000g 2432 13/08/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2445 10/09/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2631 07/12/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LA Laira (New) on 18/05/1907
NA Newton Abbot on 14/01/1911
LA Laira on 20/07/1911
BRD Bristol Bath Road on 16/02/1918
LA Laira on 28/08/1918
NA Newton Abbot on 06/01/1922
LA Laira on 09/06/1923
PDN Old Oak Common on 10/04/1926
LA Laira on 25/06/1926
NA Newton Abbot on 16/06/1927
LA Laira on 06/12/1930
EXE Exeter on 03/09/1931
BRD Bristol Bath Road on 28/01/1932
CDF Cardiff Canton m/e 05/1933
PDN Old Oak Common on 20/04/1934
82C Swindon on 01/03/1950
   Withdrawn on 06/03/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN 81A Old Oak Common m/e 31/03/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/05/1907 Diagram HAx boiler fitted (number 4016)
27/12/1910 Diagram HAx boiler fitted (number 940)
10/1912 Superheated boiler fitted
06/12/1912 Diagram HAx boiler fitted (number 4026)
15/02/1915 Diagram HAx boiler fitted (number 687)
23/08/1918 Diagram HAx boiler fitted (number 2836)
23/12/1921 Diagram HAx boiler fitted (number 4081)
01/06/1923 Diagram HAx boiler fitted (number 3438)
04/04/1925 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4612)
13/07/1929 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4653)
21/01/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4635)
20/04/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4627)
14/08/1937 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4631)
20/09/1942 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6604)
04/08/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6600)
09/01/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4611)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 05/02/1908 08/05/1908 94 days General  
Swindon Works 09/11/1908 15/02/1909 99 days General 67695
Swindon Works 20/09/1910 14/01/1911 117 days General
Boiler number 940 (Diagram HAx)
148067
Swindon Works 13/09/1912 14/12/1912 93 days General
Boiler number 4026 (Diagram HAx)
Superheated boiler fitted
225800
Swindon Works 24/10/1914 26/02/1915 126 days Heavy
Boiler number 687 (Diagram HAx)
339255
Swindon Works 19/05/1915 31/05/1915 13 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 15/09/1915 18/12/1915 95 days Heavy 355343
Swindon Works 14/12/1916 22/03/1917 99 days Heavy 441376
Swindon Works 01/03/1918 28/08/1918 181 days Heavy
Boiler number 2836 (Diagram HAx)
497938
Swindon Works 24/02/1920 30/07/1920 158 days Heavy 598145
Swindon Works 31/07/1920 03/08/1920 4 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 08/09/1921 06/01/1922 121 days Heavy
Boiler number 4081 (Diagram HAx)
660869
Swindon Works 13/02/1923 09/06/1923 117 days Heavy
Boiler number 3438 (Diagram HAx)
Tender number 1855 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
721676
Swindon Works 11/11/1924 09/04/1925 150 days Rebuilding
Boiler number 4612 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1750 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
810354
Swindon Works 29/09/1926 14/01/1927 108 days Heavy
Tender number 1938 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
896382
Swindon Works 23/04/1927 16/06/1927 55 days Light Repair
Tender number 1938 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/01/1928 18/03/1928 61 days Light Repair
Tender number 1948 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/04/1928 19/07/1928 87 days Light Repair
Tender number 2224 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 17/09/1928 05/10/1928 19 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 02/11/1928 22/11/1928 21 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 03/05/1929 18/07/1929 77 days Heavy
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2433 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1009058
Swindon Works 01/10/1930 06/12/1930 67 days Intermediate
Tender number 2447 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1086526
Swindon Works 05/12/1931 28/01/1932 55 days General
Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA)
1138032
Swindon Works 14/06/1932 17/06/1932 4 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 01/03/1933 05/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 28/02/1934 20/04/1934 52 days General
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1281582
Swindon Works 26/07/1935 08/1935   Light Repair  
Swindon Works 02/12/1935 14/02/1936 75 days Intermediate
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Renumbered to GWR (Renum) number A1
Named LLOYD'S
1371431
Swindon Works 07/05/1936 31/05/1936 25 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 29/09/1936 31/10/1936 33 days Light Repair
Tender number 2606 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/06/1937 22/08/1937 62 days General
Boiler number 4631 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2732 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1455685
Swindon Works 22/02/1938 12/03/1938 19 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 24/04/1939 07/07/1939 75 days Intermediate
Tender number 2392 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 01/1941 22/02/1941   Intermediate
Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1638048
Swindon Works 06/08/1942 21/09/1942 47 days Light Repair
Boiler number 6604 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1707980
Swindon Works 02/03/1943 09/04/1943 39 days Intermediate
Tender number 2843 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1731000
Swindon Works 31/10/1944 11/12/1944 42 days Light Repair
Tender number 2671 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/06/1945 04/08/1945 54 days General
Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2783 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1818314
Swindon Works 22/11/1946 09/01/1947 49 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2792 (Collett 4,000g Oil) attached.
1884255
Swindon Works 27/01/1947 04/02/1947 9 days Intermediate  
Swindon Works 11/09/1947 07/10/1947 27 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 04/08/1948 14/09/1948 42 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 01/07/1949 1 day Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Swindon Works New work August: No. 7016 CDF, 7017 G. J. Churchward PDN; 7430/32 STB, 7431/33 CNYD, 7434. No. 4160 is nearing completion (26/8). Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. *100A1, 1018, 1461, 1934/57, 2144, 2340, 2746/64, 2882, 2938/39, 3613/76, 3823/25/57, *3902, *3953, 4045/85, 4119, 4269, 4552, 4671, *4802, *4850, *4852, 4902/14/20/25/28/69/76, 5006/39/63/64/84, 5107/83, 5261, 5325, 5416/20, 5540, 5756, 5932/71/80/93, 6000/08/10/22, 6311/33/85, 6433. 6746, 6849/79, 6945/60, 7206/30, 7726/82, 7800/15, 8104, **8393, 8709, 9301. *Oil-burning. **Converted to 53XX. Works' pilots of late have been: Nos. 212 (since sent for scrap, w/e 21/8), 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 SLS/194810
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907
31/03/1950 The first \"Castle\" withdrawn The news of the withdrawal of Western Region locomotive No. 100A1 Lloyds, is certain to cause surprise to lovers of the G.W.R., and particularly to admirers of the 'Castle' Class. However, this locomotive, like Nos. 4000, 4016, 4032, 4037, and 4063-4072, was never strictly a new 'Castle,' but was reconstructed from the frames and certain useable parts of a 'Star' Class locomotive. Lloyds was originally turned out of Swindon Works in April, 1907, as No. 4009 Shooting Star, being the last but one of the first ten examples of that remarkable class of 4-cylinder 4-6-0 express passenger locomotives, the design of which is generally regarded as Churchward's masterpiece. The history of these locomotives was the subject of an extended survey in these pages in 1947, and need not be repeated here. But it is worth while to reflect that today the 'Stars,' modernised in certain details though virtually in their original condition, are still capable of taking top-link turns successfully when needed, whereas contemporaneous locomotives on other lines have either been scrapped or relegated to very secondary duties. However, it has recently been announced that the 'Stars' are among certain locomotives which are to be condemned during 1950 and 1951. Presumably, this includes at least the earlier examples of 'Castles' reconstructed from 'Stars.' As already stated, the original frames are included in these locomotives, and when such frames eventually wear out, rebuilding, or reconstruction, becomes uneconomical, and scrapping is the only alternative. No. 4009 Shooting Star was reconstructed as a 'Castle,' retaining the original number and name, in 1925. In February, 1936, the locomotive was renumbered 100 Al and named Lloyds, at a whim of the late Viscount Home, Chairman of the Great Western Railway at that time. The number was rendered on two separate plates. the '100' in the tipper plate and the 'Al' in the lower one, on each side of the cab. On the buffer-beam, however, the rendering was 'Al 100,' presumably to ensure that the number appeared in the normal position to the right of the drawhook. Latterly, the locomotive has carried a smokebox-door plate with the number simply '100,' though the cab plates remained 'as you were.' Thus, a 'Castle' has been condemned and we can look forward to a similar fate, within the next twelve months or so, for Nos. 4000, 4016, 4032 and 4037, at least. SLS/195005

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0118 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1780    
05/1907 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1733    
18/05/1907 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4009, name: SHOOTING STAR
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2237
Allocated to Laira (LA)
Diagram HAx boiler fitted
   
05/02/1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1908. Dep: 08/05/1908.    
09/11/1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1908. Dep: 15/02/1909.    
20/09/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1910. Dep: 14/01/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 940 (Diagram HAx)
   
14/01/1911 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
20/07/1911 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
13/09/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1912. Dep: 14/12/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4026 (Diagram HAx)
Superheated boiler fitted
   
24/10/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/10/1914. Dep: 26/02/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 687 (Diagram HAx)
   
04/05/1915 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1959    
19/05/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1915. Dep: 31/05/1915.    
15/09/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/09/1915. Dep: 18/12/1915.    
14/12/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/12/1916. Dep: 22/03/1917.    
16/02/1918 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
01/03/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/03/1918. Dep: 28/08/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2836 (Diagram HAx)
   
28/08/1918 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
1920 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1940    
24/02/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/02/1920. Dep: 30/07/1920.    
31/07/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1920. Dep: 03/08/1920.    
08/09/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/09/1921. Dep: 06/01/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4081 (Diagram HAx)
   
06/01/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
13/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/02/1923. Dep: 09/06/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3438 (Diagram HAx)
Tender number 1855 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
09/06/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
11/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 11/11/1924. Dep: 09/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4612 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1750 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
01/1926 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 3,500g Intermediate number 2378    
04/1926 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 3,500g Intermediate number 2376    
10/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
25/06/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
29/09/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/09/1926. Dep: 14/01/1927.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1938 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
23/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1927. Dep: 16/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1938 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
16/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
18/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1928. Dep: 18/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1948 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
24/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/04/1928. Dep: 19/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2224 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
09/1928 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1941    
17/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1928. Dep: 05/10/1928.    
02/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/11/1928. Dep: 22/11/1928.    
03/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/05/1929. Dep: 18/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2433 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/10/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2447 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
03/09/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
05/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1931. Dep: 28/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA)
   
28/01/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
14/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/06/1932. Dep: 17/06/1932.    
01/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/03/1933. Dep: 00/05/1933.    
05/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
12/05/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2417    
28/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1934. Dep: 20/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/04/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
26/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/07/1935. Dep: 00/08/1935.    
02/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/12/1935. Dep: 14/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Renumbered to GWR (Renum) number A1
Named LLOYD'S
   
17/02/1936 Renumbered Renumbered to 100A1    
07/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1936. Dep: 31/05/1936.    
29/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/09/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2606 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1937. Dep: 22/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4631 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2732 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938.    
24/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1939. Dep: 07/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2392 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 00/01/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/08/1942. Dep: 21/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6604 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/03/1943. Dep: 09/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2843 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1944. Dep: 11/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2671 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2783 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/11/1946. Dep: 09/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2792 (Collett 4,000g Oil) attached.
   
27/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/01/1947. Dep: 04/02/1947.    
11/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1947. Dep: 07/10/1947.    
04/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1948. Dep: 14/09/1948.    
01/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1949.    
13/08/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2432    
10/09/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2445    
07/12/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2631    
01/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
06/03/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 100A1 from Old Oak Common (81A)    

prev prev