Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2889 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16295 Week
» 69311 Month
» 188838 Year
» 3215691 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4013 |
02/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08845 |
12/1973 |
|
TOPS (09/1) |
09107 |
23/07/1993 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 08 | 02/05/1961 | 09/1 | 23/07/1993 |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
02/05/1961 to Laira (83D) |
Status |
In Service |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/05/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/1973 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4013 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Penzance (84D) |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
03/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08845 |
|
|
23/07/1993 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09107 |
|
|