Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2153 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15559 Week
» 68575 Month
» 188102 Year
» 3214955 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4015 |
17/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08847 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/05/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 03/1974 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4015 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
30/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08847 |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|