Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 203 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 203 Week
» 22709 Month
» 325899 Year
» 1547464 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4016 m/e 04/1908

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1908 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE
18/02/1938 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class Star
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Star04/1908
Castle31/10/1925
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 173
Works Number 2305
To Service During 04/1908
Withdrawal Mon 24/09/1951 off Swindon (SDN)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 3,500g Intermediate 2380 24/10/1925 GWR 3,500g
Collett 4,000g 2415 02/04/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2558 14/07/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2542 11/08/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2584 31/01/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2411 21/06/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2613 20/03/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2601 21/10/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2656 06/05/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2606 30/06/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2734 28/01/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2397 11/11/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2615 05/04/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2390 10/06/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2794 06/04/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2839 11/07/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2731 05/08/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2746 27/10/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2435 04/04/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2545 02/10/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2544 22/12/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2799 05/12/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 28/05/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2425 13/04/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2711 09/07/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2554 01/03/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1908
PDN Old Oak Common on 27/02/1926
SRD Stafford Road on 01/04/1926
PDN Old Oak Common on 25/05/1926
SRD Stafford Road on 16/08/1926
OXY Oxley on 03/10/1928
SRD Stafford Road on 17/04/1929
BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 02/1933
SDN Swindon on 14/04/1939
BRD Bristol Bath Road on 17/06/1939
NA Newton Abbot on 18/07/1940
81A Old Oak Common m/e 07/1950
   Withdrawn on 24/09/1951
82C Swindon on 27/09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 15/07/1950
WDN   m/e 30/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1909 Superheated boiler fitted
24/10/1925 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4653)
09/04/1929 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4642)
11/08/1931 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4630)
20/03/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4603)
06/05/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6606)
04/04/1942 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4652)
05/12/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6655)
13/04/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6643)
01/03/1950 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4628)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 30/01/1926 27/02/1926 29 days Light Repair  
Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) 09/12/1926 08/02/1927 62 days Heavy 853291
Swindon Works 07/11/1927 21/02/1928 107 days Heavy
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2380 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached.
Superheated boiler fitted
0
Swindon Works 04/02/1929 17/04/1929 73 days Heavy
Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
941644
Swindon Works 05/05/1930 26/07/1930 83 days Intermediate
Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1009079
Swindon Works 28/11/1932 02/1933   Intermediate
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/06/1933 21/06/1933 10 days Light Repair
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 30/01/1934 23/03/1934 53 days General
Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1213294
Swindon Works 03/05/1934 08/06/1934 37 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 03/12/1934 16/01/1935 45 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 17/09/1935 08/11/1935 53 days Intermediate 1303306
Swindon Works 24/02/1936 21/03/1936 27 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 26/05/1936 1 day Light Repair  
Swindon Works 21/09/1936 24/10/1936 34 days Light Repair
Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 07/12/1936 24/12/1936 18 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 17/03/1937 20/05/1937 65 days General
Boiler number 6606 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1388282
Swindon Works 15/06/1937 30/06/1937 16 days Light Repair
Tender number 2606 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/12/1937 14/02/1938 48 days Special
Tender number 2734 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 01/04/1938 21/04/1938 21 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 27/09/1938 23/11/1938 58 days Intermediate
Tender number 2397 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1477902
Swindon Works 03/04/1939 14/04/1939 12 days Light Repair
Tender number 2615 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/05/1939 17/06/1939 41 days Light Repair
Tender number 2390 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 16/10/1939 10/11/1939 26 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 26/03/1940 07/04/1940 13 days Light Repair
Tender number 2794 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 21/05/1940 18/07/1940 59 days Intermediate
Tender number 2839 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1546573
Swindon Works 20/11/1940 01/01/1941 43 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 25/05/1941 09/08/1941 77 days Light Repair
Tender number 2731 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 16/09/1941 28/10/1941 43 days Light Repair
Tender number 2746 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 03/02/1942 10/04/1942 67 days General
Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1607827
Swindon Works 18/10/1943 31/12/1943 75 days Intermediate
Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1670477
Swindon Works 23/10/1945 1 day General  
Swindon Works 25/04/1946 28/05/1946 34 days Light Repair
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 27/02/1948 13/04/1948 47 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2425 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1816210
Swindon Works 01/06/1949 05/07/1949 35 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 19/01/1950 01/03/1950 42 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4628 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2554 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1891856
Swindon Works 07/11/1950 18/12/1950 42 days Light Repair  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1945 Swindon Works Locos entering works during October, 1945: 2184, 2206, 2530/41, 2638, 2805/14/72/3/82/8, 2915/33/46, 3025/36, 3656, 3810/3/66, 4016/7/32/40/4154/618/96, 4517/51/64/80, 4603/17/41/53/65, 4704, 4818/31/6, 4925/9/47, 5065/84, 5208/37, 5312/56/81, 5422, 5508/22/66/72, 5718/23, 5902/21/4/8/9/64 6000/6/9/24, 6116, 6378/9, 6437, 6732/9, 6955, 7214, 7719/26/40, 8741/6, 9304/17, 9702/64. L.M.S. 8402/6/14. L.N.E. K3 17. SLS/194602
30/11/1945 Swindon Works Locos entering works during November: 13, 28, 1003, 1785, 2189, 2202/39/91, 2669, 2741, 2854, 2921/34/81, 3004/44, 3183, 3366, 3435/43, 3638, 3775/98, 3802/4/13/4/7/38/57/65, 4000/16/53/74/82/95/8, 4272 4543, 4643/58, 4826, 4965/82; 5005/17/20/6, 5125/37, 5327/50/84, 5413, 5502/23, 5735/8/59/69, 5905/16/23/32/3/9/58/69, 6002/8, 6125/57, 6353/97; 6846, 6951/4, 7243, 7712/8/73/4/7/84, 8755, 9797. The advent of a K3 to Swindon works has been commented upon in the January Journal: it has a hole in its blast pipe, a bad regulator blow-through.and a hot box on one of the driving wheels. It may be recalled that B12/3 8539 was seen on the works turntable in 1944 when she was on loan to W.D. for working Ambulance Trains, but it is not known whether, on that occasion, she had entered the works or was merely using the turntable due to some defect of the one at the shed.
The scale of withdrawals has been so great that the concentration yard has been overwhelmed, and some of the locos are stored in a road adjacent to the main line-2381/5, 2406, 1161, 3439, 2732/59 being noted- there on 21/12. Both latter engines had been dead at the home sheds for some time before their withdrawal.
SLS/194602
31/03/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. SLS/194805
30/06/1949 Swindon Works (entering Works) New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1908 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4016, name: KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2305
   
30/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1926. Dep: 27/02/1926.    
27/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
01/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
25/05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
16/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
09/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) (Heavy) - Arr: 09/12/1926. Dep: 08/02/1927.    
07/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/11/1927. Dep: 21/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2380 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached.
Superheated boiler fitted
   
03/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (OXY)    
04/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/02/1929. Dep: 17/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/04/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
05/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/05/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/08/1931 Modification Diagram HA number 4630 boiler fitted    
11/08/1931 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2542    
28/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1932. Dep: 00/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
12/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1933. Dep: 21/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1934. Dep: 23/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/05/1934. Dep: 08/06/1934.    
03/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1934. Dep: 16/01/1935.    
17/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/09/1935. Dep: 08/11/1935.    
24/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936.    
26/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1936.    
21/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1936. Dep: 24/12/1936.    
17/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1937. Dep: 20/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6606 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1937. Dep: 30/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2606 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Special) - Arr: 29/12/1937. Dep: 14/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2734 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/02/1938 Naming Renamed 'THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S)'    
01/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/04/1938. Dep: 21/04/1938.    
27/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1938. Dep: 23/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2397 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1939. Dep: 14/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2615 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
08/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2390 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
16/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1939. Dep: 10/11/1939.    
26/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1940. Dep: 07/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2794 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/05/1940. Dep: 18/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2839 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/07/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
20/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1940. Dep: 01/01/1941.    
25/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/05/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2731 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/09/1941. Dep: 28/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2746 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1942. Dep: 10/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/10/1943 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2545    
18/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/10/1943. Dep: 31/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1945.    
05/12/1945 Modification Diagram HB number 6655 boiler fitted    
05/12/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2799    
25/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1946. Dep: 28/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/02/1948. Dep: 13/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2425 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/06/1949. Dep: 05/07/1949.    
09/07/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2711    
19/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/01/1950. Dep: 01/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4628 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2554 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
07/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1950. Dep: 18/12/1950.    
24/09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 4016 from Swindon (SDN)    
27/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    

prev prev