Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 389 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18192 Week
» 71208 Month
» 190735 Year
» 3217588 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4019 |
05/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08851 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 02/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 02/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4019 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08851 |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
29/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
26/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
07/02/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08851 from Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
14/08/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|