Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 476 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18279 Week
» 71295 Month
» 190822 Year
» 3217675 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4023 |
26/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08855 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
06/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Wabtec: Doncaster Works |
|
|
26/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4023 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
22/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08855 |
|
|
25/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
22/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
06/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
26/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (AB) |
|
|
23/07/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08855 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (AB) |
|
|