Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4031 |
06/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08863 |
15/12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/08/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
06/08/1960 |
Power Unit IH4549 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4031 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
15/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08863 |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
28/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08863 from Cambridge (CA) |
|
|
10/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|