Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1092 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 2318 Week
» 21963 Month
» 56605 Year
» 1278170 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4032   03/11/1910

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/11/1910 QUEEN ALEXANDRA

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class Star
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Star03/11/1910
Castle16/04/1926
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 180
Works Number 2381
To Service Fri 03/11/1910 to Laira (LA)
Withdrawal During 12/1951 off Swindon (82C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 41 yrs , 27 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 3,500g Intermediate 2381 15/04/1926 GWR 3,500g
Collett 4,000g 2410 11/1928 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2432 23/06/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2446 10/03/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2593 11/03/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2432 01/04/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2593 04/07/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2651 31/12/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2579 09/06/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2615 14/01/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2758 21/04/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2799 11/10/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2792 17/07/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2781 27/02/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 31/08/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2425 22/01/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2791 08/12/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g 2253 10/08/1946 GWR 3,500g 5t 10cwt
Collett 4,000g 2826 25/01/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2563 03/09/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2896 30/01/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2869 15/06/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2797 28/09/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2796 27/06/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LA Laira (New) 03/11/1910
PDN Old Oak Common 23/06/1917
LA Laira 14/01/1925
EXE Exeter m/e 07/1925
LA Laira 16/04/1926
NA Newton Abbot 27/03/1929
PDN Old Oak Common 19/03/1932
LA Laira 01/04/1933
TR Truro m/e 07/1938
LA Laira m/e 10/1938
NA Newton Abbot m/e 05/1943
EXE Exeter m/e 06/1943
LA Laira 06/09/1943
NA Newton Abbot 08/06/1944
LA Laira 18/07/1944
NA Newton Abbot 08/10/1946
LA Laira m/e 11/1946
PZ Penzance 12/05/1949
LA Laira 02/11/1949
82C Swindon 27/06/1950
83B Taunton m/e 10/1950
82C Swindon 19/09/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PZ Penzance 4w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 83F Truro 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 17/10/1950
WDN   m/e 30/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/04/1926 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4656)
10/01/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4660)
11/03/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4640)
31/12/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4639)
14/01/1938 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4603)
31/08/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4655)
08/12/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6665)
03/09/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6615)
02/11/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6607)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 19/05/1911 25/05/1911 7 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 01/12/1911 07/12/1911 7 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 10/05/1912 29/06/1912 51 days General  
Swindon Works 03/04/1913 29/05/1913 57 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 15/08/1914 25/09/1914 42 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 15/09/1916 15/12/1916 92 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 25/04/1917 23/06/1917 60 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 07/11/1917 01/12/1917 25 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 28/01/1919 29/06/1919 153 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 14/09/1920 05/10/1920 22 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 14/01/1922 22/05/1922 129 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 16/10/1924 14/01/1925 91 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 07/12/1925 16/04/1926 131 days Rebuilding
Boiler number 4656 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2381 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached.
 
Swindon Works 04/10/1927 08/12/1927 66 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 09/12/1928 12/03/1929 94 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 16/03/1929 27/03/1929 12 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 01/05/1929 11/05/1929 11 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 23/04/1930 27/06/1930 66 days Heavy
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/02/1931 06/04/1931 42 days Light Repair
Tender number 2446 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 27/01/1932 19/03/1932 53 days General
Boiler number 4640 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2593 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1072997
Swindon Works 02/05/1933 07/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 21/11/1933 12/07/1934 234 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 30/10/1934 07/01/1935 70 days General
Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2651 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1219342
Swindon Works 12/02/1935 02/03/1935 19 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 26/06/1935 19/07/1935 24 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 08/01/1936 18/02/1936 42 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 29/04/1936 15/06/1936 48 days Intermediate
Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1297414
Swindon Works 15/07/1936 01/08/1936 18 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 08/02/1937 09/03/1937 30 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 27/11/1937 23/01/1938 58 days General
Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2615 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1380243
Swindon Works 16/03/1939 25/04/1939 41 days Light Repair
Tender number 2758 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 28/08/1939 13/10/1939 47 days Intermediate
Tender number 2799 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1478951
Swindon Works 24/04/1941 22/07/1941 90 days Intermediate
Tender number 2792 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1561468
Swindon Works 17/12/1941 28/03/1942 102 days Light Repair
Tender number 2781 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/07/1943 06/09/1943 59 days General
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1650358
Swindon Works 06/12/1944 22/01/1945 48 days Light Repair
Tender number 2425 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 30/10/1945 08/12/1945 40 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6665 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2791 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1752891
Swindon Works 21/07/1947 03/09/1947 45 days General
Boiler number 6615 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2563 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1843745
Swindon Works 10/05/1948 15/06/1948 37 days Light Repair
Tender number 2869 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/02/1949 12/05/1949 84 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 28/09/1949 02/11/1949 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2797 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1898620
Swindon Works 12/05/1950 27/06/1950 47 days Light Casual
Tender number 2796 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/11/1910 To Service To service as GWR Number 4032, name: QUEEN ALEXANDRA
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2381
Allocated to Laira (LA)
   
19/05/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1911. Dep: 25/05/1911.    
01/12/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1911. Dep: 07/12/1911.    
10/05/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1912. Dep: 29/06/1912.    
03/04/1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/04/1913. Dep: 29/05/1913.    
15/08/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/08/1914. Dep: 25/09/1914.    
15/09/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/09/1916. Dep: 15/12/1916.    
25/04/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1917. Dep: 23/06/1917.    
23/06/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
07/11/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1917. Dep: 01/12/1917.    
28/01/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/01/1919. Dep: 29/06/1919.    
14/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/09/1920. Dep: 05/10/1920.    
14/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/01/1922. Dep: 22/05/1922.    
16/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/10/1924. Dep: 14/01/1925.    
14/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
07/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 07/12/1925. Dep: 16/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4656 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2381 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached.
   
16/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
04/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/10/1927. Dep: 08/12/1927.    
11/1928 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2410    
09/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1928. Dep: 12/03/1929.    
16/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 27/03/1929.    
27/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
01/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/05/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929.    
10/01/1930 Modification Diagram HA number 4660 boiler fitted    
23/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/04/1930. Dep: 27/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1931. Dep: 06/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2446 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4640 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2593 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
01/04/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
01/04/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2432    
02/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/05/1933. Dep: ?/07/1933.    
04/07/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2593    
21/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1933. Dep: 12/07/1934.    
30/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1934. Dep: 07/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2651 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935.    
26/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/06/1935. Dep: 19/07/1935.    
08/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1936. Dep: 18/02/1936.    
29/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 29/04/1936. Dep: 15/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936.    
08/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/02/1937. Dep: 09/03/1937.    
27/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 23/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2615 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (TR)    
10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
16/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1939. Dep: 25/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2758 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/08/1939. Dep: 13/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2799 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1941. Dep: 22/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2792 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/12/1941. Dep: 28/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2781 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
10/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1943. Dep: 06/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
08/06/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
18/07/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
06/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1944. Dep: 22/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2425 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/10/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6665 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2791 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/08/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 3,500g number 2253    
08/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
11/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
25/01/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2826    
21/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1947. Dep: 03/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6615 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2563 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/01/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2896    
10/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1948. Dep: 15/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2869 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1949. Dep: 12/05/1949.    
12/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (PZ)    
28/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/09/1949. Dep: 02/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2797 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
12/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/05/1950. Dep: 27/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2796 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
19/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
12/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 4032 from Swindon (82C)    

prev prev