Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 852 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18655 Week
» 71671 Month
» 191198 Year
» 3218051 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4035 |
17/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08867 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
17/10/1960 |
Power Unit IH4580 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4035 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (SB) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08867 |
|
|
31/08/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08867 |
|
|
30/06/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|