Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 579 Today
» 1207 Yesterday
» 579 Week
» 20224 Month
» 54866 Year
» 1276431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MR 1641 m/e 02/1884
MR (1907) 1295 m/e 12/1907
BR 58045   16/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 1532
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 02/1884 to Manningham (29)
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 03/11/1951
Service Life 67 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
29 Manningham (New) m/e 02/1884
29 Manningham m/e 04/1892 (Snapshot)
29 Manningham m/e 01/1899 (Snapshot)
29 Manningham m/e 12/1902 (Snapshot)
29 Manningham m/e 05/1908 (Snapshot)
29 Manningham m/e 04/1914 (Snapshot)
29 Manningham m/e 12/1921 (Snapshot)
29 Manningham m/e 03/1930 (Snapshot)
29 Manningham m/e 09/1933 (Snapshot)
19B Sheffield Millhouses m/e 11/1945 (Snapshot)
15A Wellingborough 4w/e 09/09/1950
33A Plaistow 4w/e 25/11/1950
33A Plaistow 4w/e 23/12/1950
15A Wellingborough 4w/e 19/05/1951
23A Skipton 4w/e 17/07/1951
   Withdrawn 4w/e 03/11/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1894 18" Cylinders fitted
23/03/1929 LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1884 To Service To service as MR Number 1641
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Manningham (29)
   
04/1892 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (29)    
12/1894 Modification Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted    
01/1899 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (29)    
12/1902 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (29)    
12/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 1295    
05/1908 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (29)    
04/1914 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (29)    
12/1921 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (29)    
23/03/1929 Modification Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted    
03/1930 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (29)    
09/1933 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (29)    
11/1945 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
16/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58045    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (23A)    
03/11/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 58045    

prev prev