Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 454 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14497 Week
» 79451 Month
» 282115 Year
» 3308968 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2226 |
m/e |
09/1893 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1379 |
m/e |
09/1907 |
British Railways |
58072 |
|
11/08/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
1532 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Works Number |
4615 |
To Service |
During 09/1893 to Cricklewood East (15) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 03/11/1956 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/08/1951 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2226 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4615 Allocated to Cricklewood East (15) |
|
|
01/1899 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (15) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (15) |
|
|
09/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1379 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (16) |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (16) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (15) |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (M16) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (M18) |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58072 |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Highbridge (71J) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58072 |
|
|