Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 816 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18619 Week
» 71635 Month
» 191162 Year
» 3218015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2243 |
m/e |
03/1895 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1396 |
m/e |
11/1907 |
British Railways |
58076 |
|
21/04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2228 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Works Number |
3210 |
To Service |
During 03/1895 to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (25) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 21/02/1953 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1903 |
LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
10/1917 |
LMS 'C1' boiler fitted |
03/1924 |
LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
11/08/1928 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2243 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3210 Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (25) |
|
|
01/1899 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (25) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (25) |
|
|
06/1903 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1396 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (25) |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (25) |
|
|
10/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C1' boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (25) |
|
|
03/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
|
|
11/08/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (25) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (25) |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58076 |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58076 |
|
|