Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 127 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4639 Week
» 27145 Month
» 330335 Year
» 1551900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Midland Railway 2624 m/e 08/1900
Midland Railway (1907) 1424 m/e 10/1907
British Railways 58087   05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 2228
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Dübs & Co
Works Number 3911
To Service During 08/1900 to Swansea (Upper Bank) (6)
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 16/07/1955
Service Life 54 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
6 Swansea (Upper Bank) (New) m/e 08/1900
6 Swansea (Upper Bank) m/e 12/1902
6 Swansea (Upper Bank) m/e 05/1908
6 Swansea (Upper Bank) m/e 04/1914
6 Swansea (Upper Bank) m/e 12/1921
9 Spital Bridge m/e 03/1930
9 Spital Bridge m/e 09/1933
17B Burton m/e 11/1945
16A Nottingham 4w/e 30/01/1954
33A Plaistow 5w/e 24/07/1954
   Withdrawn 4w/e 16/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1909 LMS 'C' boiler fitted
07/1918 LMS 'C1' boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1900 To Service To service as Midland Railway Number 2624
Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3911
Allocated to Swansea (Upper Bank) (6)
   
12/1902 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (6)    
10/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 1424    
05/1908 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (6)    
11/1909 Modification Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted    
04/1914 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (6)    
07/1918 Modification Modification: LMS 'C1' boiler fitted    
12/1921 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (6)    
03/1930 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (9)    
09/1933 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (9)    
11/1945 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Burton (17B)    
05/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58087    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
16/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 58087    

prev prev