Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 721 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2836 Week
» 25342 Month
» 328532 Year
» 1550097 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Midland Railway 2630 m/e 09/1900
Midland Railway (1907) 1430 m/e 08/1907
British Railways 58091   26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 2228
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Dübs & Co
Works Number 3917
To Service During 09/1900 to Bourne (10B)
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 03/11/1956
Service Life 56 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
10B Bourne (New) m/e 09/1900
10B Bourne m/e 12/1902
9 Spital Bridge m/e 05/1908
5 Brecon m/e 04/1914
30 Skipton m/e 12/1921
30 Skipton m/e 03/1930
30 Skipton m/e 09/1933
20G Hellifield m/e 11/1945
15A Wellingborough 4w/e 03/10/1953
33A Plaistow 6w/e 25/12/1954
33B Tilbury 4w/e 22/09/1956
   Withdrawn 4w/e 03/11/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 13/10/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1911 LMS 'C' boiler fitted
28/12/1924 LMS 'C1' boiler fitted
06/11/1927 LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1900 To Service To service as Midland Railway Number 2630
Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3917
Allocated to Bourne (10B)
   
12/1902 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bourne (10B)    
08/1907 Renumbered Renumbered to 1430    
05/1908 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (9)    
08/1911 Modification Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted    
04/1914 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Brecon (5)    
12/1921 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30)    
28/12/1924 Modification Modification: LMS 'C1' boiler fitted    
06/11/1927 Modification Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted    
03/1930 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30)    
09/1933 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30)    
11/1945 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hellifield (20G)    
26/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58091    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
03/11/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 58091    

prev