Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 430 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14473 Week
» 79427 Month
» 282091 Year
» 3308944 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4048 |
30/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08880 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
19/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
19/12/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
30/12/1960 |
Power Unit IH4607 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4048 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
19/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08880 |
|
|
23/07/1996 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
11/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by S Norton: Liverpool |
|
|