Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 805 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14211 Week
» 67227 Month
» 186754 Year
» 3213607 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4051 |
18/01/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/01/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
18/01/1961 |
Power Unit 60F297 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/01/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4051 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/07/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4051 |
|
|
05/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|